Smith v. Brookshire Grocery Co et al
Plaintiff: Faye Smith
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc and Brookshire Grocery Co doing business as Super 1 Foods
Case Number: 6:2024cv01272
Filed: September 17, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking #here. Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/6/2026 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2026 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/18/2024. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/22/2024. Rule 26 Report due by 12/16/2024. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/26/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/27/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/26/2025. Discovery deadline 10/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2025. Daubert Motions due by 11/25/2025. Motions in Limine due by 2/23/2026. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 2/23/2026. Pretrial Order due by 3/11/2026. Bench Books due by 3/11/2026. Trial Depositions due by 3/11/2026. Real Time glossary due by 3/18/2026. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 3/18/2026. Signed by Chrissy Fontenot on 10/28/2024. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
October 15, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Brookshire Grocery Co . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Item 2)(aty,Meyers, Andrew)
October 2, 2024 Filing 13 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc. (aty,Vial, David)
October 2, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc. (aty,Vial, David) Modified on 10/3/2024 (Whitener, M).
October 2, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc.(aty,Vial, David)
October 1, 2024 Filing 10 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Faye Smith. (aty,Weaver, Jason)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 9/24/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 24, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co identifying Corporate Parent Brookshire Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent BGC Management, Inc. for Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew)
September 24, 2024 Filing 7 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew)
September 24, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brookshire Grocery Co.(aty,Meyers, Andrew)
September 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew H Meyers on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
September 18, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Andrew H Meyers, James M Dill, Nicholas A Blanda on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co, Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc, Faye Smith. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
September 18, 2024 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/18/2024. (crt,Whitener, M)
September 17, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Whitener, M)
September 17, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brookshire Grocery Co (aty,Meyers, Andrew)
September 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number C-202410770 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6060631) filed by Brookshire Grocery Co. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A, #2 Proposed exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew H Meyers added to party Brookshire Grocery Co(pty:dft))(aty,Meyers, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Brookshire Grocery Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Smith
Represented By: Jason Alan Weaver
Represented By: Nicholas A Blanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Co United Inc
Represented By: David Philip Vial, II
Represented By: James M Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Co doing business as Super 1 Foods
Represented By: Andrew H Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?