Kleinpeter v. Cajun Fast Tracks L L C et al
Plaintiff: Terry Kleinpeter
Defendant: Cajun Fast Tracks L L C and Northgate Cajun Palms L L C
Case Number: 6:2024cv01565
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: David J Ayo
Referring Judge: David C Joseph
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Terry Kleinpeter. (aty,Hernandez, Kevin)
January 2, 2025 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C. (aty,Davis, Ryan)
December 13, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Miletello, A)
December 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Terry Kleinpeter. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/12/2024. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A- Waiver Document, #3 Exhibit B- LLC Document, #4 Exhibit C- Security Agreement, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Hernandez, Kevin) Modified docket text on 12/13/2024 (Miletello, A).
November 27, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C . (aty,Davis, Ryan)
November 27, 2024 Filing 8 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C. (aty,Davis, Ryan)
November 27, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parents, E P R Lodging L L C , Northgate Cajun Palms Members L L C, E P R Properties, Vanguard Group Inc, Blackrock Inc. by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C. (aty,Davis, Ryan) Modified text on 12/2/2024 (Thomas, T).
November 20, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C.(aty,Davis, Ryan) Modified text to add jury demand on 11/20/2024 (Thomas, T).
November 20, 2024 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Northgate Cajun Palms L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event. See document #6 to view PDF image. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 11/15/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/14/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ryan Gregory Davis on behalf of Northgate Cajun Palms L L C; AND Chaz Hanley Roberts on behalf of Terry Kleinpeter. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ryan Gregory Davis on behalf of Northgate Cajun Palms L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Martin Parish, Case Number 94512 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6113305) filed by Northgate Cajun Palms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney Ryan Gregory Davis added to party Northgate Cajun Palms, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Davis, Ryan)
November 14, 2024 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Cajun Fast Tracks L L C answer due 11/21/2024; Northgate Cajun Palms L L C answer due 11/21/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #2 of document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
November 14, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kleinpeter v. Cajun Fast Tracks L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Kleinpeter
Represented By: Kevin Hernandez
Represented By: Bradley J Aldrich
Represented By: Chaz Hanley Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cajun Fast Tracks L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northgate Cajun Palms L L C
Represented By: Ryan Gregory Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?