Simon v. Brookshire Grocery Co
Plaintiff: Francine Simon
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Co doing business as Super 1 Foods #638
Case Number: 6:2024cv01591
Filed: November 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Robert R Summerhays
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by Francine Simon . (aty,Minyard, Bernard)
December 18, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking #here. Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/9/2026 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2026 11:30 AM in chambers before Judge Robert R Summerhays. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 1/8/2025. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/13/2025. Rule 26 Report due by 2/5/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/29/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/30/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/29/2025. Discovery deadline 9/29/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2025. Daubert Motions due by 10/28/2025. Motions in Limine due by 1/26/2026. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/26/2026. Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2026. Bench Books due by 2/11/2026. Trial Depositions due by 2/11/2026. Real Time glossary due by 2/18/2026. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 2/18/2026. Signed by Chrissy Fontenot on 12/18/2024. (crt,Craig-Fontenot, C)
December 3, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co identifying Corporate Parent Brookshire Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent BGC Management, Inc. for Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brookshire Grocery Co. (aty,Meyers, Andrew)
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Francine Simon. (aty,Minyard, Bernard)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/20/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/19/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew H Meyers, Bernard Ray Minyard on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co, Francine Simon. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Andrew H Meyers on behalf of Brookshire Grocery Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 15TH JDC, Vermilion Parish, Case Number C-113100 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6117776) filed by Brookshire Grocery Co. (Attachments: #1 State court petition State Court Suit Record, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Andrew H Meyers added to party Brookshire Grocery Co(pty:dft))(aty,Meyers, Andrew)
November 19, 2024 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brookshire Grocery Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #1 to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
November 19, 2024 State Court ORDER granting Voluntary Motion to Dismiss Hartford Underwriters Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #1 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 11/19/2024 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
November 19, 2024 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Brookshire Grocery Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Grocery Co doing business as Super 1 Foods #638
Represented By: Andrew H Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Simon
Represented By: Donovan Jay O'Pry, II
Represented By: Bernard Ray Minyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?