DESENA et al v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DESENA and SANDRA W DUNHAM
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE, PAUL LEPAGE, KEVIN RAYE, ROBERT NUTTING, CHARLES E SUMMERS, JR and BUREAU OF CORPORATIONS ELECTIONS & COMMISSIONS
Intervenor_defendant: MAINE DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Case Number: 1:2011cv00117
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Presiding Judge: D. BROCK HORNBY
Presiding Judge: JOHN H. RICH
Referring Judge: BRUCE M. SELYA
2 Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES & COSTS 49 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL, BRUCE M. SELYA, AND D. BROCK HORNBY. (cef)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROCEDURAL ORDER FOLLOWING CONFERENCE By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING PLAN FOR REDISTRICTING By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER By U.S. DISTRICT JUDGES GEORGE Z. SINGAL, D. BROCK HORNBY, AND CIRCUIT JUDGE BRUCE M. SELYA. (lrc)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER- Stipulated Facts and Opening Briefs shall be filed by NOON on 5/20/2011; Reply Briefs are to be filed by NOON on 5/31/2011. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING NEED FOR THREE-JUDGE COURT By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (mjlt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESENA et al v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DESENA
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA W DUNHAM
Represented By: TIMOTHY C. WOODCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL LEPAGE
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN RAYE
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT NUTTING
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES E SUMMERS, JR
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF CORPORATIONS ELECTIONS & COMMISSIONS
Represented By: PHYLLIS GARDINER
Represented By: PAUL STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: MAINE DEMOCRATIC PARTY
Represented By: JANET T. MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?