STILE v. SOMERSET COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: JAMES STILE
Defendant: SOMERSET COUNTY, SOMERSET COUNTY SHERIFF, DAVID ALLEN, MEUNIER, JACQUES, BUGBEE, CRAFTS, FAILS, POULIN, MUNN, HERRERA, PIKE, PLOURD, CAMPBELL, MARONEY, MOORE, HADEN, ALMEIDA, DAVIS, BROWN, LIBBY, SHER, JEWELL, KELLY, HINTON, RIZZO, GARLING, BOONE, DUCHARME, FRENCH, HALEY, MAGUIRE, MARTIN, POOLER, MADORE, GILBLAIR, SWOPE, JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10, STATE OF MAINE, MAINE STATE BOARD OF CORRECTIONS, MEDICAL STAFF JANE AND JOHN DOES and JANE DOE
Case Number: 1:2013cv00248
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 626 Motion for Reconsideration re 601 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,Order on Motion to Strike,Order on Motion for Order,Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1, filed by JAMES STILE By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER ON DEFENDANT DAVID ALLEN'S, RICHARD GARLING'S AND KEITH PLOURD'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 614 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 616 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 619 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO EXTEND TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE NOTICES OF APPEAL denying 607 Motion to Extend Time By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTAND PLAINTIFF'S RELATED MOTIONS dismissing 431 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and dismissing in part 431 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and dismis sing in part 434 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing 434 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; dismissing 438 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting 438 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and dismissing in part 440 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 499 Motion to Strike ; denying 562 Motion for Order Pursuant to Rule 56(d); denying 583 Motion for Ruling on Motion to Stike By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER ON MOTION FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND ON MOTION TO ACCEPT PARTIAL RESPONSES AND TO ALLOW THE RECORD TO REMAIN OPEN, AND MOTION FOR COURT TO OBTAIN BATE STAMPED MATERIALS FROM DEFENDANT[]S THAT PLAINTIFF CITED IN HIS RESPONSES TO DISPOSITIVE PLEADINGS denying 568 Motion for Judicial Intervention, Motion to Extend Time for Remaining Responses and Supplements; denying 573 MOTION to Accept Partial Response and Allow Record to Remain Open; denying 593 MOTION for Court to Obtain Bate Stamped Materials By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER AFFIRMING THE ORDER OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 496 , overruling 505 Objection By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER AFFIRMING ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A FINDING OF CONTEMPT overruling 508 Objection to Order on Motion for Contempt By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 DECISION AND ORDER denying 430 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena; denying 452 Motion to Extend Time; denying 455 Motion to Amend; denying 461 Motion to Reopen Discovery. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER denying 460 Motion for Contempt; denying 464 Motion for Contempt. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER denying 462 Motion for Judicial Intervention. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER denying 414 Special Omnibus Motion for Recusal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION denying 342 Motion to Amend. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER denying 289 Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying 234 Motion to Disqualify Defense Counsel; denying 234 Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER denying 209 Motion for Court to Serve Defendants. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER adopting 127 Report and Recommended Decision for 105 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DAVID ALLEN; granting in part, dismissing in part and denying in part 105 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DAVID ALLEN. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Amend; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Amend; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Amend. Amended Complaint to be filed on or before 8/22/14. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommended Decision re 1 Complaint filed by JAMES STILE. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STILE v. SOMERSET COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES STILE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMERSET COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOMERSET COUNTY SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEUNIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUGBEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAFTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAILS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POULIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLOURD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALMEIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIZZO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUCHARME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POOLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GILBLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWOPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE AND JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE STATE BOARD OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL STAFF JANE AND JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?