SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION INC v. SUMMIT NATURAL GAS OF MAINE INC

Plaintiff: SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION INC
Defendant: SUMMIT NATURAL GAS OF MAINE INC
Case Number: 1:2013cv00464
Filed: December 18, 2013
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Referring Judge: MARGARET J. KRAVCHUK
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE & RELATED TESTIMONY denying 119 Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report and Exclude Related Testimony By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
August 4, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 88 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommended Decision re 103 Report and Recommendations for 88 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
January 21, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IN LIEU OF PRE-FILING CONFERENCE- Joint Stipulated Record due by 2/6/2015; Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/13/2015. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due 3/13/2015; reply due by 3/27/2015 By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 21, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for In Camera Review; denying 38 Motion to Strike. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
July 22, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming the Recommended Decision 24 and granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Defendant's Counterclaim By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION INC v. SUMMIT NATURAL GAS OF MAINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHMID PIPELINE CONSTRUCTION INC
Represented By: JOHN A. HOBSON(Designation Retained)
Represented By: JOSEPH G. TALBOT(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT NATURAL GAS OF MAINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?