DREWRY v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS et al
Plaintiff: BRANDON B DREWRY
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, ELISABETH LAMSON, ROBERT CLINTON, DIXON, DEBORAH HILL, HOCKERSMITH and STOCKWELL
Case Number: 1:2014cv00392
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: GEORGE Z. SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 285 Report and Recommendations and denying 234 Motion for Injunctive Relief. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 234 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by BRANDON B DREWRY. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 282 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 203 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, STOCKWELL, ELISABETH LAMSON, ROBERT CLINTON, HOCKERSMITH, DEBORAH HILL. Objections to R&R due by 4/4/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 205 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) filed by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, STOCKWELL, ELISABETH LAMSON, ROBERT CLINTON, HOCKERSMITH, DEBORAH HILL. Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 156 Motion to Amend. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 90 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Amend; REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document; denying 44 Motion to Amend. REMINDER: After entry of this Order, if Amending a COMPLAINT, counsel are REQUIRED to separately file the AMENDED COMPLAINT Document; granting 68 Plaintiff's Supplemental Pleading; denying 75 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief; granting 84 Plaintiff's Supplemental Pleading. By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DREWRY v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON B DREWRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELISABETH LAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOCKERSMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?