MACHIAVELLI v. ABBOTT JR et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MACHIAVELLI
Defendant: HAROLD ABBOTT JR, TROY ROSS, ANTONIO MENDEZ and BRITTANY PAYSON
Case Number: 1:2015cv00340
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: JON D. LEVY
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION denying 89 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 89 Motion to Extend Time; denying 93 Objection to Scheduling Order By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nrg)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ACCEPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE 86 Report and Recommendations; granting 61 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANTONIO MENDEZ, RANDALL LIBERTY, HAROLD ABBOTT JR, TROY ROSS. Objections to R&R due by 4/18/2017. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part 41 Motion to supplement pleadings By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (CWP)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 45 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Decision By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (akr)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE adopting 13 Report and Recommendations; denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 11 Motion for TRO. By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (nwd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACHIAVELLI v. ABBOTT JR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MACHIAVELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD ABBOTT JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROY ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO MENDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY PAYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?