LAVIGNE v. US TRUSTEE

Appellant: BEVERLY ANN LAVIGNE
Appellee: US TRUSTEE
Case Number: 1:2016cv00098
Filed: February 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO COURT ORDER overruling 79 Objection By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL denying 1 Bankruptcy Appeal; denying 62 Motion for Contempt of Court ; denying 62 Motion for Show Cause Hearing for Proof of Claim; denying 62 Motion to Stay; granting 63 Motion to Amend Pre-Brief; denying 63 Motion for Hearing on Discovery. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER striking 31 Motion to Extend Time. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jlg)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER striking 24 Motion for Trial by Jury. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Injunction; denying 10 Motion for TRO; denying 19 Motion to Transfer; denying 21 Motion for Sanctions; denying 21 Motion to Vacate. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS ORDER. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Extend Time. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAVIGNE v. US TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BEVERLY ANN LAVIGNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US TRUSTEE
Represented By: STEPHEN G. MORRELL
Represented By: JENNIFER H. PINCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?