MOORE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: WALTER WILLIAM MOORE
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MARTIN MAGNUSSEN, JOESEPH FITSPATRICK, JEFFERY MERRILL, RANDALL LIBERTY, CORRECTION CARE SOLUTION, ROBERT CLINTON, CORRECTION MEDICAL SERVICES and TODD TRISH
Case Number: 1:2016cv00398
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE granting 170 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 173 Motion for Summary Judgment; and adopting 180 Report and Recommended Decision. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (slg)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CORRECTION CARE SOLUTION, ROBERT CLINTON, 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CORRECTION MEDICAL SERVICES Objections to R&R due by 8/7/2019 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting 166 Report and Recommendations for 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARTIN MAGNUSSEN, RANDALL LIBERTY, JOESEPH FITSPATRICK, JEFFERY MERRILL, Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying 126 Motion to Stay; denying 126 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 126 Motion for Documents. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting 111 Report and Recommendations; denying 89 Motion for Order for Medical Services; denying 101 Motion Requesting Judicial Review De Novo and denying 110 Second MOTION Requesting Judicial Review. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 110 Second MOTION Requesting Judicial Review filed by WALTER WILLIAM MOORE, 101 MOTION Requesting Judicial Review De Novo filed by WALTER WILLIAM MOORE, 89 MOTION for Order for Medical Services filed by WALTER WILLIAM MOORE. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2018 By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER WILLIAM MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN MAGNUSSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOESEPH FITSPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY MERRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTION CARE SOLUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT CLINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTION MEDICAL SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD TRISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?