COASTAL COUNTIES WORKFORCE INC v. LEPAGE et al
Plaintiff: COASTAL COUNTIES WORKFORCE INC
Defendant: PAUL R LEPAGE and JOHN BUTERA
Case Number: 1:2017cv00417
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Kennebec
Presiding Judge: JOHN C. NIVISON
Presiding Judge: JOHN A. WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES OR TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 70 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 47 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (MFS)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (ccs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COASTAL COUNTIES WORKFORCE INC v. LEPAGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COASTAL COUNTIES WORKFORCE INC
Represented By: KELLY W. MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL R LEPAGE
Represented By: SUSAN P. HERMAN
Represented By: NANCY M. MACIROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BUTERA
Represented By: SUSAN P. HERMAN
Represented By: NANCY M. MACIROWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?