MANUEL v. STATE OF MAINE et al

Plaintiff: GARY E MANUEL
Defendant: BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT, S MCCARTY, JASON MCAMBLEY, BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF BANGOR, E BRUNTON, STATE OF MAINE and THOMAS VALENTE
Case Number: 1:2018cv00300
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Maine District Court
Office: Bangor Office
County: Penobscot
0 Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
1 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #11 Summons Returned Executed: Docket entry modified to remove the Answer deadline as it was set in error. (jib)
September 19, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARY E MANUEL. E BRUNTON served on 9/10/2018; JASON MCAMBLEY served on 9/10/2018; S MCCARTY served on 9/10/2018; THOMAS VALENTE served on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service S MCCARTY, #2 Proof of Service E BRUNTON, #3 Proof of Service JASON MCAMBLEY, #4 Proof of Service THOMAS VALENTE, #5 Invoice S MCCARTY, #6 Invoice E BRUNTON, #7 Invoice JASON MCAMBLEY, #8 Invoice THOMAS VALENTE, #9 Envelope)(jib) Modified on 9/20/2018 to remove answer deadline (jib). (jib).
September 14, 2018 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by STATE OF MAINE. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
September 6, 2018 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT, BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, E BRUNTON, CITY OF BANGOR, JASON MCAMBLEY, S MCCARTY, THOMAS VALENTE. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
September 5, 2018 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by GARY E MANUEL. Reply due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
August 31, 2018 7 Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Service dated 8/7/2018 as to Maine Attorney General's Office, #2 Proof of Service form dated 8/7/2018 as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #3 Certified Mail Service dated 8/8/2018 as to Bangor City Hall, #4 Penobscot County Sheriffs Office Service form re Bangor Police Department, #5 Envelope)(jib)
August 23, 2018 6 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT, BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, E BRUNTON, CITY OF BANGOR, JASON MCAMBLEY, S MCCARTY, THOMAS VALENTE Responses due by 9/13/2018. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
August 16, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by STATE OF MAINE Responses due by 9/6/2018. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
August 8, 2018 4 NOTICE re #1 Exhibits to Complaint filed by GARY E MANUEL. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
August 7, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT, BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, E BRUNTON, CITY OF BANGOR, JASON MCAMBLEY, S MCCARTY, STATE OF MAINE, THOMAS VALENTE. Summons provided in hand to plaintiff. (jwr)
August 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by GARY E MANUEL (jwr)
August 7, 2018 Filing Fee Received from GARY E MANUEL: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 118000301. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: Filing fee. Date Paid: 8/7/2018 (jwr)
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT, BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT, E BRUNTON, CITY OF BANGOR, JASON MCAMBLEY, S MCCARTY, STATE OF MAINE, THOMAS VALENTE, filed by GARY E MANUEL. (Service of Process Deadline 11/5/2018) (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - Report 11-006401, #2 Ex 2 - document dated 1/31/11, #3 Ex 3 - Letter to Director dated 8/6/18, #4 Ex 4 - Bangor Daily News article, #5 Ex 4-1 - Photo, #6 Ex 4-2 - Photo, #7 Ex 6 - Law Supplemental Narrative, #8 Ex 7 - Narrative, #9 Ex 8 - Law Supplemental Narrative, #10 Ex 9 - Investigative Report, #11 Ex 10 - Certificate of Death, #12 Ex 11 - Brookings-Smith, #13 Ex 12 - 7/24/18 Waiver, #14 Ex 13 - Rental Agreement receipt, #15 Ex 14 - Receipt, #16 Ex 15 - Charles Inn receipt, #17 Ex 16 - Brewer Motor Inn receipt, #18 Ex 17 - Greyhound receipt, #19 Ex 18 - American Airline receipt, #20 Ex 19 - Enterprise Rental Agreement, #21 Ex - 20 Brookings-Smith receipt, #22 Exhibit - Photo, #23 *Sealed preliminarily per Judge Nivison*Ex 5 - Photos)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANUEL v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY E MANUEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR FIRE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S MCCARTY
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON MCAMBLEY
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANGOR POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BANGOR
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E BRUNTON
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS VALENTE
Represented By: FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?