MUDIE v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Plaintiff: LLOYD MUDIE
Defendant: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00301
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Office: Bangor Office
County: Somerset
0 Judge: JON D LEVY
1 Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. (UHL, ERIC)
September 25, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2018 as to DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. (akr)
September 11, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for DOLLAR TREE STORES INC per Order No. 8: Answer due by 11/16/2018. (lrc)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Following a brief telephonic hearing held at my request with Attorneys Butler and Uhl for the plaintiff and defendant respectively, the defendant's deadline to respond to the plaintiff's complaint is extended to November 16, 2018. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the parties shall complete their private, anticipated alternative dispute resolution by the new November 16, 2018, deadline. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 9/11/2018 re: ECF No. 5; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint: Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2018 08:00 AM with MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel shall coordinate the call and contact chambers once both sides are on the line. (nrg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DOLLAR TREE STORES INC Responses due by 9/27/2018. (UHL, ERIC)
September 4, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for DOLLAR TREE STORES INC : Answer due by 9/18/2018. (akr)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LLOYD MUDIE. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC served on 8/28/2018. (BUTLER, LISA)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
August 8, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1882052.), filed by LLOYD MUDIE.(BUTLER, LISA)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC with Jury Demand filed by LLOYD MUDIE. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/5/2018) Fee due by 8/9/2018.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUDIE v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLOYD MUDIE
Represented By: LISA J. BUTLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC
Represented By: ERIC J. UHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?