TRUE NORTH MAINE INC et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: COOKE AQUACULTURE INC and TRUE NORTH MAINE INC
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00333
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by TRUE NORTH MAINE INC, COOKE AQUACULTURE INC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/16/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/11/2017 Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 8/18/2017 letter from Liberty Mutual, #3 Exhibit C - 6/18/2018 letter to Liberty Mutual)(DEVOE, WILLIAM)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss True North Complaint filed by COOKE AQUACULTURE INC, TRUE NORTH MAINE INC. Reply due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - June 18, 2018 letter)(DEVOE, WILLIAM)
September 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss True North Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lavinia Weizel, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nancy D. Adams filed by ZACHARY B. BRANDWEIN on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
August 29, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline per Order ECF #7 for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY: Answer due by 9/27/2018. (jib)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to September 27, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 28, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1892270.), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Plaintiffs by COOKE AQUACULTURE INC, TRUE NORTH MAINE INC. (DEVOE, WILLIAM)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 9/18/2018. (BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (BRANDWEIN, ZACHARY)
August 23, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY : Answer due by 8/30/2018. (bfa)
August 23, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2018. (bfa)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. No PDF document attached. See #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, case number MACSC-CV-2018-20. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/21/2018) Fee due by 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 summary sheet, #3 complaint, #4 summons, #5 acceptance of service)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUE NORTH MAINE INC et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOKE AQUACULTURE INC
Represented By: WILLIAM B. DEVOE
Represented By: KADY S. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUE NORTH MAINE INC
Represented By: WILLIAM B. DEVOE
Represented By: KADY S. HUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ZACHARY B. BRANDWEIN
Represented By: NANCY D. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?