KENNEDY v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Defendant: MAINE STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION and STATE OF MAINE
Undetermined: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Case Number: 1:2018cv00339
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 JUDGMENT It is hereby ORDERED that any motion for attorney's fees shall be filed within the time specified in Local Rule 54.2 of this Court. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE #7 . By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (MSH)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Authorization to File Electronically by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY (akr)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #7 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Facts, #3 Errors, #4 Envelope)(akr)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY (bfa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY (bfa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, MAINE STATE BAR ASSOCIATION, STATE OF MAINE, UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW with Jury Demand, filed by EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY. (Service of Process Deadline 11/26/2018) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 law of the case, #2 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD THOMAS KENNEDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE STATE BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF MAINE SCHOOL OF LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?