CYR v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Plaintiff: LINDA M CYR
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00347
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 23, 2018 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/20/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 8/27/2019. Motions due by 9/10/2019. Ready for Trial on 11/5/2019. (MFS)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting in part #12 Objection to Scheduling Order and Amended Scheduling Order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Joint OBJECTION to #8 Scheduling Order, with Proposed Discovery Plan filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2018. (BIXBY, PHILLIP)
October 9, 2018 Set Deadlines : Attorney MONICA V PENNISI MARSICO & FRANCIS J. GREY shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/17/2018. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (lrc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Monica V. Pennisi Marsico filed by PHILLIP S. BIXBY on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (BIXBY, PHILLIP) Modified on 10/9/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Francis J. Grey, Jr. filed by PHILLIP S. BIXBY on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (Total admission fee $ 200 receipt number 0100-1911273.) (BIXBY, PHILLIP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (BIXBY, PHILLIP)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/20/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/27/2019. Motions due by 3/13/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew G. Counts filed by BLAIR A. JONES on behalf of LINDA M CYR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1908794.) (JONES, BLAIR)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of E. Todd Tracy filed by BLAIR A. JONES on behalf of LINDA M CYR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1908787.) (JONES, BLAIR)
October 3, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2018. (akr)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by GENERAL MOTORS LLC.(BIXBY, PHILLIP)
September 17, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for GENERAL MOTORS LLC per Summons Returned Executed filed on 9/17/2018: Answer due by 10/3/2018. (lrc)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by LINDA M CYR. GENERAL MOTORS LLC served on 9/12/2018. (JONES, BLAIR) Modified on 9/18/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
September 1, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1894066.), filed by LINDA M CYR.(JONES, BLAIR)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GENERAL MOTORS LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENERAL MOTORS LLC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LINDA M CYR. (Service of Process Deadline 11/29/2018) Fee due by 9/4/2018.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CYR v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: FRANCIS J. GREY
Represented By: MONICA V. PENNISI MARSICO
Represented By: PHILLIP S. BIXBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA M CYR
Represented By: BLAIR A. JONES
Represented By: ANDREW G. COUNTS
Represented By: E. TODD TRACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?