KITCHIN et al v. LIBERTY et al
Plaintiff: DANA B KITCHIN and DANIELLE KITCHIN
Defendant: KENNEBEC COUNTY, GEORGE M JABAR, II, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, RANDALL LIBERTY, KEN MASON, NANCY G RINES, CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC, PATSY G CROCKETT, KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE and JENNIFER MIX DO
Case Number: 1:2018cv00356
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by PATSY G CROCKETT, GEORGE M JABAR, II, KENNEBEC COUNTY, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION, KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, RANDALL LIBERTY, KEN MASON, NANCY G RINES.(MARCHESI, PETER)
October 15, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC and JENNIFER MIX DO : Answer due by 11/13/2018. (akr)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JENNIFER MIX DO waiver sent on 10/9/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed GEORGE M JABAR, II waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed NANCY G RINES waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed PATSY G CROCKETT waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KENNEBEC COUNTY waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KEN MASON waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed RANDALL LIBERTY waiver sent on 9/27/2018. (ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by PATSY G CROCKETT, GEORGE M JABAR, II, KENNEBEC COUNTY, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION, KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, RANDALL LIBERTY, KEN MASON, NANCY G RINES.(MARCHESI, PETER)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JENNIFER MIX. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (akr)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFFS against All Defendants, filed by DANA B KITCHIN, DANIELLE KITCHIN. (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2018)(BURKE, JOHN)
September 7, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1896576.), filed by DANIELLE KITCHIN.(ZERILLO, TIMOTHY)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RANDALL LIBERTY,KEN MASON, KENNEBEC COUNTY,KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, PATSY G CROCKETT, NANCY G RINES, GEORGE M JABAR, II, CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Ken Mason, #2 Summons Issued as to Kennebec County, #3 Summons Issued as to Kennebec County Sheriff's Office, #4 Summons Issued as to Kennebec County Corrections Division, #5 Summons Issued as to Kennebec County Correctional Facility, #6 Summons Issued as to Patsy G Crockett, #7 Summons Issued as to Nancy G Rines, #8 Summons Issued as to George M Jabar II, #9 Summons Issued as to Correctional Health Partners LLC)(sfw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RANDALL LIBERTY, KEN MASON, KENNEBEC COUNTY, KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION, KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, PATSY G CROCKETT, NANCY G RINES, GEORGE M JABAR, II, CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DANA B KITCHIN, DANIELLE KITCHIN. (Service of Process Deadline 12/5/2018) Fee due by 9/10/2018.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KITCHIN et al v. LIBERTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBEC COUNTY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE M JABAR, II
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONS DIVISION
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBEC COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL LIBERTY
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN MASON
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY G RINES
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONAL HEALTH PARTNERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATSY G CROCKETT
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNEBEC COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: PETER T. MARCHESI
Represented By: CASSANDRA S. SHAFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER MIX DO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA B KITCHIN
Represented By: TIMOTHY ZERILLO
Represented By: JOHN M. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE KITCHIN
Represented By: TIMOTHY ZERILLO
Represented By: JOHN M. BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?