DUNIFER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER et al
Plaintiff: JASON D DUNIFER
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Case Number: 1:2018cv00371
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER : Answer due by 11/16/2018. (sfw)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JASON D DUNIFER. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Return receipts)(DUFOUR, JAMES)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 ATTORNEY GENERAL summons, #2 U.S. ATTORNEY summons)(bfa)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JASON D DUNIFER (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by JASON D DUNIFER. (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2018)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNIFER v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON D DUNIFER
Represented By: JAMES A. DUFOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?