VIOLETTE v. BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Defendant: GENERAL MILLS INC and BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00372
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #10 State Court Record, : This docket entry was modified to change affiant name from BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC to BRIAN P VOKE. (sfw)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by Brian P. Voke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Docket Record, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Summons Filed on September 4, 2018, #4 Exhibit D Certified Mail-Return Receipt, #5 Exhibit E Summary Sheet, #6 Exhibit F Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal)(VOKE, BRIAN) Modified on 9/21/2018 to change affiant name from "Betty Crocker General Mills Inc" to "Brian P. Voke"(sfw).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/7/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/14/2019. Motions due by 2/28/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Case Opening Filing Fee Paid, #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 NOTICE of Interested Parties, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement : changed party name to reflect party name as named in the complaint. (bfa)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding : Defendant's name changed to relect the party as named in the complaint. (bfa)
September 14, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1900012.), filed by BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC.(VOKE, BRIAN) Modified on 9/20/2018 to reflect party name as named in the complaint (bfa).
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/21/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC.(bfa) Modified on 9/20/2018 to reflect party name as named in the complaint (bfa).
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC. (bfa) Modified on 9/20/2018 to reflect party name as named in the complaint (bfa).
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties by BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC (bfa) Modified on 9/20/2018 to reflect party name as named in the complaint (bfa).
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County District Court, case number CV-2018-179. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC . (Service of Process Deadline 12/12/2018) Fee due by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A complaint, #2 Exhibit B notice of filing notice of removal, #3 Exhibit C summons)(bfa) Modified on 9/20/2018 to reflect party name as named in the complaint (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIOLETTE v. BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MILLS INC
Represented By: BRIAN P. VOKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY CROCKER GENERAL MILLS INC
Represented By: BRIAN P. VOKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY PAUL VIOLETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?