KEACH v. NEW BRUNSWICK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED et al
Appellee: MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED and NEW BRUNSWICK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED
Appellant: ROBERT J KEACH
Debtor: MONTREAL MAINE & ATLANTIC RAILWAY LTD
Case Number: 1:2018cv00383
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 12/7/2018. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court Hearing on ECF 2313 Objection held on 08/22/2018 before Judge Peter G. Gary. This transcript is restricted and any request for a copy should be directed to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (jwr)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Appellant Designation, #2 BAP Appellant Brief, #3 BAP Appellee Brief, #4 BAP Appellant Reply Brief, #5 BAP Opinion, #6 BAP Judgment, #7 BAP Motion for Certification, #8 BAP Order on Certification, #9 Transcript of hearing 11/20/2015, #10 Transcript of hearing 2/5/2016, #11 Transcript of hearing 2/24/16, #12 Notice Recipients)(jwr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 13-10670., filed by ROBERT J KEACH. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 11/5/2018.) (Attachments: #1 appeal transmittal form, #2 order, #3 order, #4 docket sheet)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEACH v. NEW BRUNSWICK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MAINE NORTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HULL
Represented By: ROGER CLEMENT
Represented By: ALAN R. LEPENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NEW BRUNSWICK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED
Represented By: ALAN R. LEPENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ROBERT J KEACH
Represented By: LINDSAY K.Z. MILNE
Represented By: ADAM R. PRESCOTT
Represented By: ROBERT J. KEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: MONTREAL MAINE & ATLANTIC RAILWAY LTD
Represented By: NATHANIEL R. HULL
Represented By: ROGER CLEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?