E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC v. RASKIN
Plaintiff: E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC
Defendant: MUSHKY SHUSTERMAN-RASKIN and MUCHKY RASKIN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00404
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Complaint : Entry #1 was modified to remove MUSHKY SHUSTERMAN-RASKIN as a party defendant from text, and to remove with jury demand from text. (bfa)
October 9, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1910795.), filed by E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC.(PELLEGRINI, ANTHONY)
October 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Fee due by 10/9/2018. (jib)
October 5, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/10/2018. (jib)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright; copy e-mailed to U.S Copyright Office. (bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties by E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC (bfa) Modified on 10/2/2018 (bfa)to correct name of filing party.
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MUCHKY RASKIN, PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/31/2018) Fee due by 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyrighted design owned by Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringing design sold by Defendant)(bfa) Modified on 10/18/2018 to remove MUSHKY SHUSTERMAN-RASKIN and with Jury Demand from text entry (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC v. RASKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUSHKY SHUSTERMAN-RASKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUCHKY RASKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E BOUCHARD COMPANY INC
Represented By: ANTHONY D. PELLEGRINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?