TOWNSEND v. ST CROIX TISSUE INC
Plaintiff: IDA C TOWNSEND
Defendant: ST CROIX TISSUE INC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00441
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for ST CROIX TISSUE INC per Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed on 11/9/2018: Answer due by 12/31/2018. (lrc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ST CROIX TISSUE INC waiver sent on 10/30/2018. (TINKLE, MARSHALL) Modified on 11/9/2018 to reflect the correct date that the waiver of service was sent (lrc).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against IDA C TOWNSEND, filed by IDA C TOWNSEND. (Service of Process Deadline 1/31/2019)(TINKLE, MARSHALL) Modified on 11/2/2018 to include jury demand text (lrc).
October 24, 2018 Filing Fee Received from IDA C TOWNSEND: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-1918647. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: filing fee. Date Paid: 10/23/2018 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ST CROIX TISSUE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ST CROIX TISSUE INC with Jury Demand filed by IDA C TOWNSEND PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 1/22/2019) Fee due by 10/24/2018.(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOWNSEND v. ST CROIX TISSUE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IDA C TOWNSEND
Represented By: MARSHALL J. TINKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST CROIX TISSUE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?