ELLIOTT v. PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL HEALTH AND MEDICAL DEPT
Plaintiff: JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL HEALTH AND MEDICAL DEPT
Case Number: 1:2018cv00450
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 INDICATION by JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT of Intent to Proceed. (jgd)
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 11/26/2018. (MFS)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 11/26/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Address by JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT (jwr)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT (jwr)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL HEALTH AND MEDICAL DEPT filed by JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT. (Service of Process Deadline 1/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELLIOTT v. PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL HEALTH AND MEDICAL DEPT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL HEALTH AND MEDICAL DEPT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY EVAN ELLIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?