CUNNINGHAM v. ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM
Defendant: ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC and FUTURE AGENCY LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FUTURE AGENCY LLC. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
February 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties by FUTURE AGENCY LLC (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/27/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/5/2019. Motions due by 7/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
February 1, 2019 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from FUTURE AGENCY LLC by 2/8/2019. (slg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by FUTURE AGENCY LLC.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
January 29, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC - Per Order #7: Answer due by 2/7/2019. (mnw)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to February 7, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 29, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC by 2/5/2019. (mnw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC Responses due by 2/19/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
January 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 1/31/2019. (slg)
January 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for FUTURE AGENCY LLC - Per Summons Returned Executed #5: Answer due by 2/1/2019. (mnw)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM. FUTURE AGENCY LLC served on 1/11/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM. ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC served on 1/10/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
January 7, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1953081.), filed by CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC, FUTURE AGENCY LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Asplundh Tree Expert LLC summons)(bfa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC, FUTURE AGENCY LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM. (Service of Process Deadline 4/4/2019) Fee due by 1/7/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CUNNINGHAM v. ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPLUNDH TREE EXPERT LLC
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUTURE AGENCY LLC
Represented By: DANIEL P. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?