BIRBRAGHER et al v. ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC
Plaintiff: ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER and ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER
Defendant: ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00043
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - Pursuant to Order #17 entered on March 25, 2019: Discovery due by 9/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/26/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. (mtm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/26/2019. Motions due by 10/15/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 21, 2019 Case Reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR no longer assigned to the case. (sfw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order with incorporated memorandum of law in support of revised discovery plan by ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC Responses due by 4/11/2019. (DOUGLASS, PAUL) Modified on 3/21/2019 to remove incorporated memorandum of law language from motion text (mtm).
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge John C. Nivison by ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC. (DOUGLASS, PAUL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 REDACTED Document re #1 Complaint,, Exhibit A and Exhibit B by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(FOSTER, CHRISTIAN)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/26/2019. Motions due by 8/9/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 1:19-cv-43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC.(DOUGLASS, PAUL)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC waiver sent on 2/15/2019. (FOSTER, CHRISTIAN)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal. Exhibits A and B shall be sealed. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 (Document sealed from public view) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and Exhibit B by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER Responses due by 3/18/2019. (FOSTER, CHRISTIAN)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re #6 Additional Attachments filed by ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER, ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER. Although the Clerk's Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document and separately filing a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (sfw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 (Document sealed from public view) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER re #1 Complaint,, . Main Document: Exhibit B: Email Corr to Robin Hood Camp. (FOSTER, CHRISTIAN) Modified on 2/26/2019 to seal attached document per Order #10 (slg).
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 (Document sealed from public view) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER re #1 Complaint,, . Main Document: Exhibit A: DA Police Investigation Corr. (FOSTER, CHRISTIAN) Modified on 2/26/2019 to seal attached document per Order #10 (slg).
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Defendant by All Defendants (DOUGLASS, PAUL) Modified on 2/11/2019 to clean up docket text (sfw).
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL S. DOUGLASS on behalf of All Defendants (DOUGLASS, PAUL)
January 25, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1965239.), filed by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER.(FOSTER, CHRISTIAN)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER, ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER. (Service of Process Deadline 4/25/2019) Fee due by 1/28/2019.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIRBRAGHER et al v. ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLANDO BIRBRAGHER
Represented By: CHRISTIAN C. FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS BIRBRAGHER
Represented By: CHRISTIAN C. FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBIN HOOD CAMP INC
Represented By: PAUL S. DOUGLASS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?