REYNOLDS v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS
Defendant: CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY and ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines : Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/7/2019. Motions due by 10/21/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. (akr)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part #18 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. On March 11, 2019, I held a telephonic hearing in this reach-and-apply action on the parties' joint motion to extend certain pretrial deadlines with Attorney Furbish for the plaintiff and Attorneys Riseberg, Feit, and Birocco for the defendants. After discussion, I agreed to extend the deadlines by approximately three months, as requested, through the parties' expert disclosure deadlines, but applied the court's customary intervals thereafter. Accordingly, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 15, is amended as follows: initial disclosures shall be served by April 15, 2019; the plaintiff shall disclose her experts by July 30, 2019; and, the defendants shall disclose their experts by August 30, 2019. The remaining pretrial deadlines shall be set according to the court's customary intervals as follows: discovery to be completed by September 30, 2019; the plaintiff's written demand and the defendants' written response shall be served by September 16 and 30, 2019, respectively; any Local Rule 56(h) notice to be filed by October 7, 2019; the dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions deadline is reset to October 21, 2019; and the case shall be removed from the September trial list and placed on the December trial list, to be trial-ready by December 3, 2019. All other limitations and deadlines in the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 15, shall otherwise remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 3/11/2019 re: ECF No. 18; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 First MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 03:00 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel are instructed to call chambers at the number provided once all the parties are on the line. (slg)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 First MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 3/21/2019. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 Reply to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #4 by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Riseberg, John McGivney, Maxwell Feit filed by JOSHUA E. BIROCCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1977793.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/27/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/5/2019. Motions due by 7/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 State Court Record .. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to replace "Additional Attachments" with "Affidavit" (akr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #11 State Court Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet : These entries have been marked "Filed in Error" and terminated on the system. (akr)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR*** STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to remove "with Affidavit"(akr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR*** CIVIL COVER SHEET Penobscot County Superior Court. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr).
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to add CHUBB as filer and counterclaimant (akr).
January 28, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1965831.), filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
January 28, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY : Answer due by 2/1/2019. (bfa)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/4/2019. (bfa)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/4/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number BANSCCV 2018-159. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/25/2019) Fee due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 notice regarding electronic service, #3 service of process, #4 summons)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSHUA E. BIROCCO
Represented By: MAXWELL B. FEIT
Represented By: JOHN J. MCGIVNEY
Represented By: MICHAEL D RISEBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSHUA E. BIROCCO
Represented By: MAXWELL B. FEIT
Represented By: JOHN J. MCGIVNEY
Represented By: MICHAEL D RISEBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS
Represented By: STEVEN D. SILIN
Represented By: ROBERT FURBISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?