FAGRE v. IRELAND et al
Plaintiff: JESSICA L FAGRE
Defendant: MARK BROWN, SCOTT W IRELAND and JEFFREY PARKS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00083
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by SCOTT W IRELAND, JEFFREY PARKS. (BOLTON, JONATHAN)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK BROWN. (BENJAMIN, EDWARD) Modified on 4/4/2019 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JESSICA L FAGRE. Reply due by 4/8/2019. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
March 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim per Order on Motion to Extend Time: Responses due by 3/25/2019. (jwr)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time To File Response to Motions to Dismiss By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time To File Response to Motions to Dismiss by JESSICA L FAGRE Responses due by 4/12/2019. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
March 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss per Order on Motion to Extend Time: Responses due by 3/22/2019. (jwr)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Mark Brown's Motion to Dismiss By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARK BROWN'S MOTION TO DISMISS by JESSICA L FAGRE Responses due by 4/5/2019. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JESSICA L FAGRE. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by SCOTT W IRELAND, JEFFREY PARKS Responses due by 3/22/2019. (BOLTON, JONATHAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: CONSENT TO REMOVAL by SCOTT W IRELAND, JEFFREY PARKS (BOLTON, JONATHAN)
February 25, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1980284.), filed by MARK BROWN.(BENJAMIN, EDWARD)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK BROWN Responses due by 3/15/2019. (jwr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by MARK BROWN. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Record)(jwr)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by MARK BROWN with State Court Pleadings complaint and state court docket sheet from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number AUGSC-CV-2019-00026. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 5/23/2019) Fee due by 2/25/2019.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAGRE v. IRELAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK BROWN
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT W IRELAND
Represented By: JONATHAN R. BOLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY PARKS
Represented By: JONATHAN R. BOLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA L FAGRE
Represented By: HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?