US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. KING
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: GREG A KING
Interested Party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00119
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Docket filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. Reply due by 7/19/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 (Document sealed from public view) MOTION to Seal Docket by GREG A KING Responses due by 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. Reply due by 7/2/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to Counterclaim 18 by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (DOONAN, JOHN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(HUSTON, JENNIFER)
May 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 18 Counterclaim : This entry has been modified to add "No PDF attached. See ECF #13 and ECF #16" (akr)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Special Deposit. Reading the pro se defendant's filing liberally, the court construes the defendant/counterclaim plaintiff's "Bill of Complaint in Equity; Presentment to Void Proceedings and Jurisdiction" (ECF No. 13 at 1) as a motion to dismiss ("Presentment to Void Proceedings and Jurisdiction") and counterclaim ("Bill of Complaint in Equity"). Accordingly, the clerk of court is directed to establish standard briefing schedules as to both. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER From Clerk's Office Providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout. (tcs)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE re #13 SPECIAL DEPOSIT. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that ECF #13 SPECIAL DEPOSIT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Verified Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit B Certified Corpus of Trust, # 3 Envelope) contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (tcs) Modified on 5/29/2019 to include text referencing ECF #13(tcs).
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 COUNTERCLAIM (No PDF attached. See ECF #13 and ECF #16) against US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST, filed by GREG A KING.(akr) Modified on 5/30/2019 (akr).
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss (No PDF attached. See ECF #13 and ECF #16) by GREG A KING Responses due by 6/18/2019. (akr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 SPECIAL DEPOSIT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Verified Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit B Certified Corpus of Trust, #3 Envelope) (tcs)
May 10, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for GREG A KING : Answer due by 5/30/2019. (akr)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - No Action Necessary on #10 Objection. See ECF No. 11. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Bond filed by GREG A KING. The defendant was served in this foreclosure action on April 5, 2019, and the court set an answer deadline of April 26, 2019. See ECF No. 6 and 4/10/19 docket entry. On April 25, 2019, the defendant filed a document titled "Silver Surety Bond[,]" ECF No. 9, but not an answer that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, the defendant is ORDERED to file within 21 days hereof, or by May 30, 2019, an answer to the plaintiff's complaint, failing which he is cautioned that he may be subject to default. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #9 Bond filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. Responses due by 5/15/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 29, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 5/28/2019. (akr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 BOND by GREG A KING (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Ex. A to Affidavit, #3 Envelope) (akr)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/26/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Support Lien, #2 Exhibit B - Agent Affidavit)(HUSTON, JENNIFER) Modified on 4/11/2019 to remove duplicative text (akr).
April 10, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for GREG A KING : Answer due by 4/26/2019. (akr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. GREG A KING served on 4/5/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (DOONAN, JOHN)
March 22, 2019 Filing Fee Received from US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST: Amount Paid: 400. Receipt Number: 0100-1993732. Method of Payment: CC. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 3/22/2019 (akr)
March 21, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/28/2019. (bfa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GREG A KING, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Maine Department of Health and Human Services summons)(bfa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREG A KING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 6/19/2019) Fee due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Wells Fargo, #5 Exhibit E Quitclaim Assignment, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G 2016 Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H 2017 Loan Modification, #9 Exhibit I Demand Letters, #10 Exhibit J Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG A KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: JENNIFER G. HUSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?