ALMODOVAR v. WILKIE
Plaintiff: CARLOS ALMODOVAR
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/23/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/30/2019. Motions due by 11/13/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/7/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 5, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT WILKIE. (Attachments: #1 Formal EEO Complaint, VA Form 4939 (Mar. 15, 2016) - REDACTED)(LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
June 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES G. NOUCAS, JR on behalf of CARLOS ALMODOVAR (NOUCAS, JAMES)
June 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER terminating #15 Order to Show Cause. Counsel are expected to comply at all times with requirements of District of Maine Local Rule 83.1(c). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE/CORRESPONDENCE Re: Plaintiff's Response to OTSC (ECF Nos. 15-16) by ROBERT WILKIE (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert F. Stone filed by ROBERT F. STONE on behalf of CARLOS ALMODOVAR (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2026909.) (STONE, ROBERT)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO #15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by CARLOS ALMODOVAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(STONE, ROBERT)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
May 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Attorney Robert F. Stone shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 5/10/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Entry of Local Counsel and filing of Certification Pro Hac Vice due by 5/10/2019. (jgd)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for AUSA Annapurna Balakrishna to Withdraw as Attorney. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Attorney AUSA Annapurna Balakrishna to Withdraw as Attorney by ROBERT WILKIE Responses due by 5/23/2019. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
April 30, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline per Order #12 for ROBERT WILKIE: Answer due by 6/6/2019. (jgd)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jgd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ROBERT WILKIE Responses due by 5/21/2019. (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
April 29, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Attorney Robert F. Stone and Annapurna Balakrishna shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 5/3/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Entry of Local Counsel and filing of Certification Pro Hac Vice due by 5/3/2019 as to Attorney Stone. (jgd)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW K. LIZOTTE on behalf of ROBERT WILKIE (LIZOTTE, ANDREW)
April 18, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ROBERT WILKIE : Answer due by 5/6/2019. (jwr)
April 18, 2019 Set Deadlines to register for ECF and obtain local counsel : Attorney Robert F. Stone and Annapurna Balakrishna shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 4/26/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. Specific Document Deadline (1) due by 4/26/2019 to obtain local counsel. (jwr)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:18-cv-12061. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to to District of Maine. Original file with documents numbered all documents, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER DUE TO LACK OF VENUE (Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Maine, filed by Carlos Almodovar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Maine. filed by Robert Wilkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Balakrishna, Annapurna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Want of Venue, MOTION to Transfer Case to Maine.( Responses due by 4/4/2019) by Robert Wilkie.(Balakrishna, Annapurna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wilkie Robert. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wilkie Robert Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7348964 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Carlos Almodovar.(Stone, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/3/2018) (Jones, Sherry). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Sherry). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #2 Category Sheet) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 4/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALMODOVAR v. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLOS ALMODOVAR
Represented By: ROBERT F. STONE
Represented By: JAMES G. NOUCAS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: ANNAPURNA BALAKRISHNA
Represented By: ANDREW K. LIZOTTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?