KENNEDY v. BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: SHANEA KENNEDY
Defendant: BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00182
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal by SHANEA KENNEDY. (HAY, JORDAN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: Counsel having advised the Court on 6/10/2019 that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter within thirty (30) days of this date and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a). Stipulation of Dismissal due by 7/10/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
May 28, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC - Per Order #14: Answer due by 6/10/2019. (mnw)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting without objection #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by June 10, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC Responses due by 6/14/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1)- Docket Record, #2 Exhibit A (2) Order re Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit A (3) Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit A (4) Summons, #5 Exhibit A (5) Motion for Leave to Withdraw RSW & Notice of Appearance of BC & Order granting motion, #6 Exhibit A (6) Complaint & Request for Jury Trial with Injunctive Relief Sought)(CATERINE, MELINDA)
May 8, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC - Per Order #11: Answer due by 5/28/2019. (mnw)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by May 28, 2019 (May 27 being a holiday). By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC Responses due by 5/28/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
May 7, 2019 Reset Deadlines - Per Order #9: State Court Record due by 5/13/2019. (mnw)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting without objection #8 Agreed-Upon Motion to Extend Time. Counsel for the defendant shall file by May 13, 2019, a complete copy of the record of this case in the state court as made prior to removal, which shall include the written record (docket sheet) of all actions taken by the state court in the matter prior to removal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Certified State Court Record by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC Responses due by 5/28/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
May 1, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC - Per Order #6: Answer due by 5/13/2019. (mnw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET [Amended]. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by May 13, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
April 30, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2012510.), filed by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC (bfa)
April 30, 2019 Answer Deadline for BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC : Answer due by 5/6/2019. (bfa)
April 30, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/7/2019. (bfa)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/7/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Androscoggin County Superior Court, case number CV-19-20. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 7/29/2019) Fee due by 5/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - complaint, #2 Exhibit B - motion to extend time to answer, #3 Exhibit C - proposed order)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2019: #4 notice of filing notice of removal) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNEDY v. BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARCLAYS SERVICES LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN SHAPIRO
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANEA KENNEDY
Represented By: JORDAN PAYNE HAY
Represented By: BRADEN M. CLEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?