FOGG-INMAN v. FISTER, MD et al
Plaintiff: JOANN L FOGG-INMAN
Defendant: JEFFREY FISTER, MD, PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Docket Report as of 5/7/19, #2 12/28/18 - Complaint w. Attached Medical Records, #3 12/28/18 - Summary Sheet, #4 12/28/18 - Motion to Proceed w.o. Fee & 1/8/19 Endorsed Order Granting Same, #5 1/8/19 - Dr. Fister's Motion for Enlargement of Time & 2/21/19 Endorsed Order Denying as Moot, #6 1/15/19 - Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, #7 2/19/19 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time, #8 2/21/19 - Return of Service (Dr. Fister Served 2/1/19), #9 2/21/19 - Return of Service ("Penobscot Community Dental Center" Served 2/1/19), #10 2/25/19 - USAO Letter, #11 5/6/19 - United States' Notice of Removal w. Attachments)(EILER, ASHLEY)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 5/28/2019. (EILER, ASHLEY)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Party by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 5/28/2019. (EILER, ASHLEY)
May 3, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for JEFFREY FISTER, DMD, PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER : Answer due by 5/10/2019. (bfa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/10/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Meredith Torres filed by JEFFREY FISTER, MD, PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 notification deeming the medical center eligible for FTCA malpractice coverage)(bfa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION of Halsey B. Frank filed by JEFFREY FISTER, MD, PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER. (bfa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number CV-18-169., filed by JEFFREY FISTER, MD, PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER. (Service of Process Deadline 8/1/2019) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 complaint, #3 defendants' motion for enlargement of time, #4 order granting enlargement of time, #5 : USAO Letter to State Court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOGG-INMAN v. FISTER, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN L FOGG-INMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY FISTER, MD
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Represented By: MEGAN SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENOBSCOT COMMUNITY DENTAL CENTER
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Represented By: MEGAN SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?