YOUNG v. MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES et al

Plaintiff: KAREN JO YOUNG
Defendant: EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS and MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00202
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines - per Order No. 11: Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/27/2019. Motions due by 1/13/2020. Ready for Trial on 3/3/2020. (lrc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 relief requested in Objection to Scheduling order and granting Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The parties shall be permitted up to 8 depositions per side. Deadline to complete discovery is extended to December 20, 2019; deadline to file notice of intent to file motion for summary judgment is extended to December 27, 2019; deadline to file dispositive motions and Daubert and Kumho motions is extended to January 13, 2020; case to be ready for trial by March 3, 2020. All other aspects of the Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT Proposed Discovery and Motion Filing Plan Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference and Partial Objection to Standard Discovery Order With Proposed Discovery Plan by EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 6/21/2019 to change event type to motion to amend scheduling order (lrc).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/28/2019. Motions due by 11/12/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/7/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 1, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
June 1, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS. (RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
June 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES.(RANDLETT, JOSHUA)
May 21, 2019 Set Answer Deadline: Answer due from MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES and EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS by 6/3/2019. (slg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREN JO YOUNG. MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES served on 5/13/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAREN JO YOUNG. EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS served on 5/13/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
May 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2017652.), filed by KAREN JO YOUNG.(HANSEN, CHAD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities summons)(bfa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS, MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by KAREN JO YOUNG. (Service of Process Deadline 8/5/2019) Fee due by 5/9/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS
Represented By: THAD B. ZMISTOWSKI
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES
Represented By: THAD B. ZMISTOWSKI
Represented By: JOSHUA A. RANDLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN JO YOUNG
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?