MENESES v. CAMPBELL

Petitioner: ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES
Respondent: DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00206
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Settlement and PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT: that settlement has been effected by mutual agreement of the parties herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel shall complete the settlement of this matter by 7/15/2019 and cause to be filed a stipulation of dismissal of this matter with prejudice and without costs, failing which, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 41.1(a).( Stipulation of Dismissal due by 7/22/2019.) By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (CJD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER: Settlement Conference held. Settlement achieved. (Court Reporter: FTR) (CJD)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. If the parties are unable to resolve the case at the settlement conference scheduled for June 6, 2019, there shall be a pre-hearing conference on June 11, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Portland. All attorneys shall appear in person for the pre-hearing conference. The final hearing is scheduled for June 14, 2019, in Bangor. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 6/6/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Walker's Chambers before JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. In Camera Settlement Papers due by NOON on 6/4/2019.) By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK (jwr)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Discovery is limited to 30 requests for admission and 30 interrogatories for each party. The parties shall file their requests for admission and interrogatories by 5/22/2019. The deadline for disclosures is 6/5/2019. Pretrial motions, including motions in limine, due by noon on 6/7/2019. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Continued Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (mnw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (mnw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 2:30 PM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO #9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL. (ROBINSON, RANDY)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING : Telephone Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 9:30 AM before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. Counsel shall coordinate amongst themselves who will initiate the conference call to chambers. (mnw)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. During today's hearing, the Petitioner and the Respondent agreed to video communication contact between the Petitioner and the Children at least five (5) times each week. If the Petitioner and the Respondent are unable to agree on the timing of the video communications, they can look to counsel to assist with the scheduling of the calls. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 13, 2019 Filing 15 RECEIPT FOR PASSPORTS, PASSPORT CARDS AND SOCIAL SECURITY CARDS issued by United States of America for R.C.M. and D.A.C.M.(jwr)
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : Show Cause Response due by NOON on 5/17/2019. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN: Show Cause Hearing held. Respondent to file response to order to show cause by noon on 5/17/2019. Conference call to be scheduled early next week. Final hearing to be scheduled early June should the parties opt not to participate in a judicial settlement conference. (Court Reporter: Melissa Merenberg, Interpreter: Luis O. Garcia) (jwr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by TARA A. WALKER on behalf of ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES (WALKER, TARA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by KRISTINA FINLEY on behalf of ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES (FINLEY, KRISTINA)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal. DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL served on 5/9/2019. (mnw)
May 9, 2019 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Petition and Order Directing Service. (mnw)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion for Expedited Hearing on Verified Petition per Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 9). By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SHOW CAUSE ORDER : Hearing set for 5/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Bangor Courtroom 2 before JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnw)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Telephonic Participation at hearing on May 13, 2019. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (MMB)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mnw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause requiring an Expedited Hearing by ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES Responses due by 5/29/2019. (bfa) Modified on 5/9/2019 to add order to show cause text(bfa).
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Telephonic Participation by ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES Responses due by 5/29/2019. (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR RETURN OF CHILDREN against DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL, filed by ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D.A.C.M. Birth Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - R.C.M. Birth Certificat, #3 Exhibit C - Court Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Hague Packet, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Code)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENESES v. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANA MARIA MIRANDA MENESES
Represented By: PAUL MCDONALD
Represented By: KRISTINA FINLEY
Represented By: TARA A. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DUSTIN LLOYD CAMPBELL
Represented By: RANDY L. ROBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?