ADAMS v. NURSE AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL et al
Plaintiff: JUSTAN ADAMS
Defendant: NURSE AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL and WORKERS AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00214
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by JUSTAN ADAMS. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JUSTAN ADAMS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE: Filing Fee OR Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 6/4/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NURSE AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, WORKERS AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL, filed by JUSTAN ADAMS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/8/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS v. NURSE AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORKERS AT RIVERVIEW HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTAN ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?