REICHERT v. ABBOTT et al
Plaintiff: ROBROY REICHERT
Defendant: MATTHEW MAGNUSSON, RANDALL A LIBERTY, HAROLD D ABBOTT, JR and JENNIFER JENKINS
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
July 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by ROBROY REICHERT pursuant to Order No. 10 entered on 7/23/2019: Objections to R&R due by 8/9/2019 (lrc)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to File Objections to Recommended Decision. The Court construes Plaintiff's filing to request in part an extension of the time to file objections to the recommended decision. The time is extended to August 9, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ROBROY REICHERT (Attachments: #1 Partial report of Eric G. Mart PhD dated 3/25/99, #2 Grievance form dated 2/13/19, #3 2nd Grievance form dated 2/13/19, #4 Self-Report dated 3/31/19, #5 Grievance form dated 4/2/19, #6 Grievance form dated 5/6/19, #7 Self-Report dated 5/23/19, #8 Self-Report dated 4/25/19, #9 Astronomy Magazine Subscription Notice, #10 Revolver Subscription Notice, #11 Envelope)(jwr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by ROBROY REICHERT. Objections to R&R due by 7/23/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from the Clerk's Office Regarding Collection of Fees (lrc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 INDICATION by Prisoner ROBROY REICHERT of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
May 31, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 6/20/2019. (MFS)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 6/20/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re Trust Account Statement attached to the #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROBROY REICHERT. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBROY REICHERT (Attachments: #1 certificate, #2 trust account statement)(jwr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HAROLD D ABBOTT, JR, JENNIFER JENKINS, RANDALL A LIBERTY, MATTHEW MAGNUSSON filed by ROBROY REICHERT. (Service of Process Deadline 8/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REICHERT v. ABBOTT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MAGNUSSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL A LIBERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAROLD D ABBOTT, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBROY REICHERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?