FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. ALLEN et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: DAVID W ALLEN, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC and GRACE E ALLEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00277
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 9/9/2019 as to DAVID W ALLEN, GRACE E ALLEN and MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. (jwr)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC : Answer due by 8/8/2019. (sfw)
August 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 9/5/2019 as to DAVID W ALLEN, GRACE E ALLEN. (sfw)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. GRACE E ALLEN served on 6/20/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. DAVID W ALLEN served on 6/20/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC served on 7/18/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 18, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2036465.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 18, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/25/2019. (bfa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAVID W ALLEN, GRACE E ALLEN, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Grace E. Allen summons, #2 Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc summons)(bfa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVID W ALLEN, GRACE E ALLEN, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/16/2019) Fee due by 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into FNMA, #5 Exhibit E Quitclaim Assignment, #6 Exhibit F Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit G Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. ALLEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID W ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRACE E ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?