BRETSCHER v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Plaintiff: MARILYN BRETSCHER
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00332
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 25, 2019 Reset State Court Record Deadline Pursuant to Order at ECF #10 : Defendant's counsel shall file the State Court "duplicate record" by 7/30/2019. (tcs)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting without objection #9 Motion to Amend Procedural Order. Defendant's counsel shall file the State Court "duplicate record" by July 30, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Amend Procedural Order by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP Responses due by 8/14/2019. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/4/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 12/11/2019. Motions due by 12/26/2019. Ready for Trial on 3/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 17, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2049565.), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(bfa)
July 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/23/2019. (bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/23/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number KENSC-CV-19-141. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRETSCHER v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN BRETSCHER
Represented By: JASON M. JABAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?