FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. POMELOW et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant: KERRY POMELOW and TIMOTHY POMELOW
Interested Party: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment as to CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION on 10/18/2019. (tcs)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest, Credit Acceptance Corporation by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/10/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 18, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to KERRY POMELOW on 10/18/2019. (tcs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to KERRY POMELOW served on 8/23/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification to indicate wrong document attached regarding #12 Letter. Corrected letter to pro se filer was filed at docket Entry No. 12 to include date and ECF number in letter. (tcs)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout as to TIMOTHY POMELOW. (tcs) Modified on 9/5/2019 replace PDF with correct letter to add date and ECF number (tcs).
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by TIMOTHY POMELOW Responses due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
August 26, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TIMOTHY POMELOW : Answer due by 9/5/2019. (tcs)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. TIMOTHY POMELOW served on 8/15/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION on 9/20/2019. (tcs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to TIMOTHY POMELOW. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (tcs)
August 7, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION : Answer due by 8/19/2019. (tcs)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION served on 7/29/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(EILER, ASHLEY)
July 31, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE : Answer due by 9/23/2019. (tcs)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 7/25/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 24, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2053183.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/21/2019)(DOONAN, JOHN)
July 23, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/30/2019. (bfa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, KERRY POMELOW, TIMOTHY POMELOW. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Timothy Pomelow summons, #2 Bank of New York Mellon summons, #3 Credit Acceptance Corporation summons, #4 Internal Revenue Service summons)(bfa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KERRY POMELOW, TIMOTHY POMELOW PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 10/21/2019) Fee due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Note, #4 Exhibit D Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E Assignment into BAC Home Loans, #6 Exhibit F Assignment into Bank of America, #7 Exhibit G Assignment into Nationstar, #8 Exhibit H Declatory Judgment, #9 Exhibit I Assignment into FNMA, #10 Exhibit J Demand Letters, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. POMELOW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY POMELOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY POMELOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: ASHLEY E. EILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?