GOGUEN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ROBERT GOGUEN
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00351
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Certified Mail Service Returned by US Attorney General on 9/9/2019 as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (tcs)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Certified Mail Service Returned by United States Attorney's Office on 9/5/2019 as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (tcs)
September 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for United States of America : Answer due by 11/4/2019. (tcs)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Attorney General)(tcs)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk will prepare the required summons(es) for service by certified mail on the United States of America. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (tcs)
September 3, 2019 Summons completed and mailed via certified mail return receipt along with a copy of the Complaint to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (tcs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER to Business Office regarding collection of fees. (tcs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT GOGUEN of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 20, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 9/10/2019. (MFS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT GOGUEN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfw)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ROBERT GOGUEN (sfw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by ROBERT GOGUEN. (Service of Process Deadline 10/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOGUEN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT GOGUEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?