PAQUETTE v. CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN et al
Plaintiff: DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR
Defendant: PENNY BAILEY, TIM APP, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS ADMIN, HANNAH MONACO, ROBYN EGAN, LEPAGE ADMIN, CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN and JOSEPH FITZPATRICK
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00370
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Objection to Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to 12 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, filed by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lrc)
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court discerns no reason to reconsider its earlier decision denying Plaintiff's prior request for counsel. (Order, ECF No. 5.) Any objections to this Order shall be filed in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER mooting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis The Court granted Plaintiff's prior request to proceed in forma pauperis. (Order, ECF No. 7.) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR (jwr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Declaration)(jwr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR re #1 Complaint. Main Document: Table of Contents. (Attachments: #1 Federal Civil Action, #2 Discrimination Synopsis, #3 Law Cases Cited - Notes Omitted, #4 Lacy v. Butts, #5 Does v. Snyder, #6 USA v. Von Behren, #7 Indiana's SOMM Program Declared Unconstiutional, #8 Counseling and Psychotherapy Treatment Agreement, #9 Full Disclosure Sexual History Questioonnaire, #10 Victim form, #11 Notice of Termination from Residential Programming, #12 Witness Statement Mitchell Sounier, #13 Witness Statement Robert L. Robinson III, #14 Envelope)(jwr)
September 11, 2019 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 10/2/2019. (MFS)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 10/2/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR (Attachments: #1 Notification of Address Change, #2 Letter to the Court, #3 Cover Page, #4 Envelope)(lrc)
August 21, 2019 Set Deadlines per Order No. 4 entered on 8/21/2019: Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or filing fee due by 9/11/2019. (lrc)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR (bfa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR (bfa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TIM APP, PENNY BAILEY, CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN, ROBYN EGAN, JOSEPH FITZPATRICK, LEPAGE ADMIN, MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS ADMIN, HANNAH MONACO, filed by DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR. (Service of Process Deadline 11/12/2019) (Attachments: #1 requested relief, #2 letter from Jim Horowitz, #3 Cumberland County Court civil action, #4 Maine Supreme Court civil action, #5 Maine Human Rights Commission civil action, #6 order for entry of judgment in Colorado civil action, #7 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAQUETTE v. CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY BAILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIM APP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS ADMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH MONACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBYN EGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEPAGE ADMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPC RULE PROGRAM ADMIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH FITZPATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID FONTES PAQUETTE, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - PRISONER CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?