STONE v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC et al
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA STONE
Defendant: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC and FAMILY DOLLAR INC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00399
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT OBJECTION to Scheduling Order by VIRGINIA STONE. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON) Modified on 10/25/2019 to remove duplicate text (jgd).
October 24, 2019 Set Deadlines : Attorney KEVIN J. O'LEARY shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 10/31/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (clp)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. O'Leary filed by JOSHUA E. BIROCCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2098300.) (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/6/2020. Motions due by 3/20/2020. Ready for Trial on 6/2/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FAMILY DOLLAR INC. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by FAMILY DOLLAR INC.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by DOLLAR TREE STORES INC.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA)
September 25, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer : Answer due by 10/10/2019 from Defendants. (jwr)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 10, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by DOLLAR TREE STORES INC, DOLLAR TREE STORES INC, FAMILY DOLLAR INC Responses due by 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 9/25/2019 to add all defendants as filers (mlm).
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIRGINIA STONE. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIRGINIA STONE. FAMILY DOLLAR INC served on 9/5/2019. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by VIRGINIA STONE. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC served on 9/5/2019. (WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
September 1, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2071972.), filed by VIRGINIA STONE.(WHOLEY BRIGGS, ALISON)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DOLLAR TREE STORES INC, FAMILY DOLLAR INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Family Dollar,Inc. summons, #2 Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., dba Family Dollar,Inc. summons)(bfa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC, FAMILY DOLLAR INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VIRGINIA STONE. (Service of Process Deadline 11/29/2019) Fee due by 9/3/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STONE v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOLLAR TREE STORES INC
Represented By: JOSHUA E. BIROCCO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMILY DOLLAR INC
Represented By: JOSHUA E. BIROCCO
Represented By: KEVIN J. O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA STONE
Represented By: ALISON A. WHOLEY BRIGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?