MAN AGAINST XTINCTION v. COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES et al
Plaintiff: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION and MAX
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES and ASSISTANT ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Not Yet Classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Case Number: 1:2019cv00406
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties Handout (mjlt)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION (jwr)
September 26, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Properly completed Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 10/18/2019. (MFS)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Second Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting in part #7 Motion for Detailed Explanation of Errors; granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to file request to proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Detailed Explanation of Errors, MOTION to Extend Time for Corrective Filing by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION (jwr)
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis : Property completed Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due by 9/24/2019. (jwr)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Maximus Strahan Supporting Request for TRO)(jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION (Attachments: #1 AO239 Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees)(jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF CLAIMS OF MATERIAL FACTS by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION in support of #1 Complaint. (bfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSISTANT ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE, COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES with Jury Demand, filed by MAN AGAINST XTINCTION. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION v. COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAN AGAINST XTINCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF MARINE RESOURCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSISTANT ADMINISTRATOR OF NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - NON PRISONER IFP CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?