GRENDELL v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S GRENDELL
Defendant: JEREMY CARON, JOHN DOE, ROBERT BURKE, MAINE STATE POLICE BOMB TEAM, CHRIS TREMBLAY, BRIAN BEAN, TUCKER BONNEVIE, BRYAN CREAMER, MAINE STATE POLICE, GOVERNMENT AGENCY A, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, JONAH OROAK, ALDEN BUSTARD, BERNARD CAMPBELL, DAVID COFLESKY, GREGORY ROY, CALEB MCGARY, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, JANE DOE, BRIAN MACMASTER, ANDREW HARDY, JEFFERY MILLS, JOHN E COTE and STATE OF MAINE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00419
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for STATE OF MAINE, JOHN E COTE, MAINE STATE POLICE, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, BRIAN MACMASTER, BRIAN BEAN, ROBERT BURKE, ALDEN BUSTARD, BERNARD CAMPBELL, JEREMY CARON, DAVID COFLESKY, BRYAN CREAMER, ANDREW HARDY, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, CALEB MCGARY, JEFFERY MILLS, JONAH OROAK, GREGORY ROY, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, CHRIS TREMBLAY : Answer due by 11/26/2019. (akr)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting without objection #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint by BRIAN BEAN, ROBERT BURKE, ALDEN BUSTARD, BERNARD CAMPBELL, JEREMY CARON, DAVID COFLESKY, JOHN E COTE, BRYAN CREAMER, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, ANDREW HARDY, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, BRIAN MACMASTER, MAINE STATE POLICE, CALEB MCGARY, JEFFERY MILLS, JONAH OROAK, GREGORY ROY, STATE OF MAINE, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, CHRIS TREMBLAY Responses due by 11/27/2019. (TAUB, CHRISTOPHER)
September 18, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for STATE OF MAINE, JOHN E COTE, MAINE STATE POLICE, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, BRIAN MACMASTER, BRIAN BEAN, ROBERT BURKE, ALDEN BUSTARD, BERNARD CAMPBELL, JEREMY CARON, DAVID COFLESKY, BRYAN CREAMER, ANDREW HARDY, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, CALEB MCGARY, JEFFERY MILLS, JONAH OROAK, GREGORY ROY, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, CHRIS TREMBLAY : Answer due by 11/12/2019. (akr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed All Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service Burke, #2 Waiver of Service Bustard, #3 Waiver of Service Campbell, #4 Waiver of Service Caron, #5 Waiver of Service Hardy, #6 Waiver of Service Harriman, #7 Waiver of Service MacMaster, #8 Waiver of Service Maine State Police, #9 Waiver of Service McGary, #10 Waiver of Service Mills, #11 Waiver of Service O'Roak, #12 Waiver of Service Roy, #13 Waiver of Service State of Maine, #14 Waiver of Service Sweeny, #15 Waiver of Service Tremblay, #16 Waiver of Service Coflesky, #17 Waiver of Service Cote, #18 Waiver of Service Creamer, #19 Waiver of Service Grotten)(WILLEY, N.)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BRIAN BEAN, TUCKER BONNEVIE, ROBERT BURKE, ALDEN BUSTARD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Alden Bustard, #2 Summons Issued as to Tucker Bonnevie, #3 Summons Issued as to Brian Bean)(mtm)
September 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2077476.), filed by MICHAEL S GRENDELL.(WILLEY, N.)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BERNARD CAMPBELL, JEREMY CARON, DAVID COFLESKY, JOHN E COTE, BRYAN CREAMER, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, ANDREW HARDY, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, BRIAN MACMASTER, MAINE STATE POLICE, MAINE STATE POLICE BOMB TEAM, CALEB MCGARY, JEFFERY MILLS, JONAH OROAK, GREGORY ROY, STATE OF MAINE, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, CHRIS TREMBLAY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Benjamin Sweeney summons, #2 Gregory Roy summons, #3 Jonah O'Roak summons, #4 Brian MacMaster summons, #5 State of Maine summons, #6 Maine State Police Bomb Team summons, #7 Jeffery Mills summons, #8 Caleb McGary summons, #9 Christopher Harriman summons, #10 Andrew Hardy summons, #11 Bryan Creamer summons, #12 David Coflesky summons, #13 Jeremy Caron summons, #14 Bernard Campbell summons, #15 Christopher Grotten, #16 Maine State Police summons, #17 John Cote summons)(bfa) Modified on 9/13/2019 to remove names Brian Bean, Tucker Bonnevie, Robert Burke, Alden Custard, Michael S. Grendell as no summonses were issued for them (mtm).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIAN BEAN, TUCKER BONNEVIE, ROBERT BURKE, ALDEN BUSTARD, BERNARD CAMPBELL, JEREMY CARON, DAVID COFLESKY, JOHN E COTE, BRYAN CREAMER, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, GOVERNMENT AGENCY A, CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN, ANDREW HARDY, CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN, BRIAN MACMASTER, MAINE STATE POLICE, MAINE STATE POLICE BOMB TEAM, CALEB MCGARY, JEFFERY MILLS, JONAH OROAK, GREGORY ROY, STATE OF MAINE, BENJAMIN SWEENEY, CHRIS TREMBLAY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by MICHAEL S GRENDELL. (Service of Process Deadline 12/10/2019) Fee due by 9/13/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRENDELL v. STATE OF MAINE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY CARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE STATE POLICE BOMB TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS TREMBLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUCKER BONNEVIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN CREAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT AGENCY A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER HARRIMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER GROTTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONAH OROAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDEN BUSTARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID COFLESKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY ROY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALEB MCGARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN MACMASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HARDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN E COTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL S GRENDELL
Represented By: N. LAURENCE WILLEY, JR.
Represented By: EZRA A.R. WILLEY
Represented By: DAVID W. BATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?