MABEE et al v. ECKROTE et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY R MABEE and JUDITH B GRACE
Defendant: RICHARD ECKROTE and JANET ECKROTE
Case Number: 1:2019cv00432
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JANET ECKROTE, RICHARD ECKROTE Responses due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sarah I. Gilbert, #2 Exhibit A Defendants' Joint Opposition, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Colleen Tucker, #4 Exhibit C Affidavit of Erik Heim, #5 Exhibit Affidavit D of Janet Eckrote, #6 Exhibit E Plaintiffs' Opposition to Joinder)(GILBERT, SARAH) Modified on 11/4/2019 to add exhibit letters and remove duplicative language (akr).
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE. (Service of Process Deadline 1/23/2020) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mabee Grace Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Good Deeds Survey, #3 Exhibit C1 - Deed Hartley to F. Poor, #4 Exhibit C2 - Deed F Poor tp W&P Poor, #5 Exhibit C3 - Deed W&P Poor to P. Poor, #6 Exhibit C4 - Deed Estate of Poor to Eckrote, #7 Exhibit D - Eckrote -NAF Easement, #8 Exhibit E - Good Deeds Survey, #9 Exhibit F - Email String, #10 Exhibit G - BPL Final Findings)(STROUT, DANA)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JUDITH B GRACE, JEFFREY R MABEE. Reply due by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ferris v Hargrave Decision, #2 Exhibit B - Ferris v Hargrave Case File)(STROUT, DANA)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Sarah I. Gilbert re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JANET ECKROTE, RICHARD ECKROTE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(GILBERT, SARAH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by JANET ECKROTE, RICHARD ECKROTE Responses due by 11/5/2019. (GILBERT, SARAH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH I. GILBERT on behalf of All Defendants (GILBERT, SARAH)
October 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for JANET ECKROTE and RICHARD ECKROTE : Answer due by 10/17/2019. (akr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE. (STROUT, DANA)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE. RICHARD ECKROTE served on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Richard Eckrote)(STROUT, DANA) Modified on 10/9/2019 to remove duplicative text (akr).
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE. JANET ECKROTE served on 9/26/2019. (STROUT, DANA) Modified on 10/9/2019 (akr).
September 20, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2081796.), filed by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE.(STROUT, DANA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JANET ECKROTE, RICHARD ECKROTE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Janet Eckrote summons)(bfa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JANET ECKROTE, RICHARD ECKROTE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JEFFREY R MABEE, JUDITH B GRACE. (Service of Process Deadline 12/18/2019) Fee due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Deed, #2 Exhibit B - 2012 Good Deeds Survey, #3 Exhibit C1 - Deed, #4 Exhibit C2 - Deed, #5 Exhibit C3 - Deed, #6 Exhibit C4 - Deed, #7 Exhibit D - Easement, #8 Exhibit E - 2018 Good Deed Survey)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MABEE et al v. ECKROTE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY R MABEE
Represented By: KIMBERLY J. ERVIN TUCKER
Represented By: DANA F. STROUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH B GRACE
Represented By: KIMBERLY J. ERVIN TUCKER
Represented By: DANA F. STROUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ECKROTE
Represented By: SARAH I. GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET ECKROTE
Represented By: SARAH I. GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?