FRANCIS v. KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ANTHONY FRANCIS
Defendant: KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00434
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Record Sheet, #2 Exhibit Letters in State Court Record, #3 Exhibit State Court Summary Sheet, #4 Exhibit Letter to State Court w summons and initial documents, #5 Exhibit Ntc of Filing of Removal to State Court, #6 Exhibit Ntc of Appearance of DPS, #7 Exhibit State Court Summons Returned, #8 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #9 Exhibit State Court Summons and NEF)(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/9/2020. Ready for Trial on 5/5/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
September 26, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2084570.), filed by KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
September 24, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION : Answer due by 9/30/2019. (bfa)
September 24, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/1/2019. (bfa)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/1/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal to Plaintiffs Counsel (bfa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kennebec County Superior Court, case number cv-19-190. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 12/23/2019) Fee due by 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 2.Ex. 1 State Court Complaint, #2 3.Ex. 2 State Court Summons, #3 4.Ex. 3 State Court Summary Sheet, #4 5.Ex. 4 Notice of Filing of Removal to State Court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANCIS v. KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMAN INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By: DANIEL P. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY FRANCIS
Represented By: JOHN E. BALDACCI
Represented By: STEPHEN C. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?