CAIN v. WILSON
Petitioner: DONALD CAIN
Respondent: ERIC WILSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00449
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE. This case has been closed and the 2255 Petition has been docketed in the underlying criminal case 1:16-cr-00103-JAW. (jwr)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00660. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The court ORDERS that the document filed August 22, 2019, in this action be, and is hereby, construed as a motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255, and be, and is hereby, transferred to the District of Maine for consideration as part of Case No. 1:16-CR-00103-JAW. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/3/2019) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Sep 9 09:34:44 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Therefore, the court is giving applicant an opportunity to withdraw the filing. If he does not withdraw the filing by September 24, 2019, the court may proceed to construe the motion as one brought under 2255. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/6/2019) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Donald Cain must address the following deficiency: The $5.00 filing fee has not been paid nor has an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of inmate trust account been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/26/2019) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Fri Aug 23 08:15:07 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/23/2019) (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)[Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Donald Cain. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAIN v. WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DONALD CAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?