CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. MAHON et al
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Defendant: KIMBERLY J MAHON and CHARLES P MILLER
Interested Party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC, ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION LLC and GEMINI CAPITAL
Case Number: 1:2019cv00499
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC, MIDLAND FUNDING LLC & PALISADES COLLECTION LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Arrow Financial Services, LLC Summons (Attachments: #1 Midland Funding, LLC Summons, #2 Palisades Collection, LLC Summons)(mnd)
December 11, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for GEMINI CAPITAL : Answer due by 1/6/2020. (tcs)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed GEMINI CAPITAL waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (YORK, BRENT)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KIMBERLY J MAHON, CHARLES P MILLER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Kimberly J. Mahon summons)(bfa)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (YORK, BRENT)
November 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2103721.), filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC.(YORK, BRENT)
October 30, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/6/2019. (bfa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIMBERLY J MAHON, CHARLES P MILLER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 1/27/2020) Fee due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - legal description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, #6 Exhibit F - Declaratory Judgment, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Default, #8 Exhibit H - Military Statement, #9 Exhibit I - Palisades Collection, LLC Writ of Execution, #10 Exhibit J - Arrow Financial Services, LLC Writ of Execution, #11 Exhibit K - Gemini Capital Writ of Execution, #12 Exhibit L - Midland Funding, LLC Writ of Execution)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC v. MAHON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PALISADES COLLECTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GEMINI CAPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY J MAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES P MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: BRENT A. YORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?