HALL v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL et al
Plaintiff: RILEY JEAN HALL
Defendant: AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL and WILLIAM GRANT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00503
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (clp)
November 15, 2019 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (clp)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the Clerk's Office regarding collection of fees. (mnw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 INDICATION by Prisoner RILEY JEAN HALL of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 11/21/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 11/21/2019. (MFS)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RILEY JEAN HALL (Attachments: #1 account ledger)(bfa)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL, WILLIAM GRANT, filed by RILEY JEAN HALL. (Service of Process Deadline 1/28/2020) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RILEY JEAN HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AROOSTOOK COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?