RAYMOND v. GRANT
Plaintiff: COREY MARC RAYMOND
Defendant: WILLIAM GRANT
Case Number: 1:2019cv00529
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 20, 2019 Set Deadlines: Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 12/11/2019. (MFS)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due 12/11/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by COREY MARC RAYMOND (Attachments: #1 spending account)(bfa)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILLIAM GRANT, filed by COREY MARC RAYMOND. (Service of Process Deadline 2/18/2020) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAYMOND v. GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY MARC RAYMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?