SZILLERY
Not Classified By Court: TRUSTEE
Appellant: EVA J SZILLERY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00554
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL terminating #8 Order to Show Cause ; dismissing #1 Bankruptcy Appeal By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER to Attorney Leddy by EVA J SZILLERY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tcs)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER NOTICE (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service Papers)(jwr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 1/16/2020. By DEPUTY CLERK: Teagan Snyder (tcs)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues to be Presented, #2 Notice of Recipients)(tcs)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court - Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case and Generic Motion held on 7/25/2019 before Judge Michael A. Fagone. Any request for a copy of this transcript should be directed to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (jwr)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerks Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout as to EVA J SZILLERY. (tcs)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Received on December 5, 2019 (Main Document: Amended Notice of Appeal dated December 2, 2019) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues to be Presented, #2 Exhibit A- Explanation of Unsecured Nonpriority Claim, #3 Exhibit A- Settlement Agreement and Mutual Release, #4 Exhibit B- Application for Registration, #5 Maine Mathematics, Science and Engineering Talent Search)(mjlt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #6 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #7 Minute Order 7/25/2019) (tcs).
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 05-11636., filed by EVA J SZILLERY. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 1/21/2020.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Form, #2 minute order, #3 University of Maine Proof of Claim, #4 minute entry dated 6/20/06, #5 docket sheet)(bfa) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2019 to replace incorrect PDF with correct PDF of transmittal form (mjlt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SZILLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: TRUSTEE
Represented By: ANDREW M. DUDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: EVA J SZILLERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?